THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 04:48:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: International Islamic Univ. Malaysia, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, MALAY

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-726-1000
Fax: 705-726-0762
Address: 190 Cundles Rd E
Suite 303
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Haqqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haqqi (CPSO#: 86959 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, MALAY
Medical School: International Islamic Univ. Malaysia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-726-1000
Fax: 705-726-0762
Address: 190 Cundles Rd E
Suite 303
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Haqqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haqqi (CPSO#: 86959 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD NOWZAD ISMAIL HAQQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQQI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD NOWZAD ISMAIL HAQQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQQI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: International Islamic Univ. Malaysia, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007