THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:31:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Capital Cardiology
602-2 Gurdwara rd
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857
Address: 36-747 Silver Seven Rd
Kanata ON K2V 0H2
Phone: 6137144666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Nassoh Hafez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hafez (CPSO#: 86961 )
Business Address: 602 - 2 Gurdwara Road
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2
(613) 714-9855
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Capital Cardiology
602-2 Gurdwara rd
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857
Address: 36-747 Silver Seven Rd
Kanata ON K2V 0H2
Phone: 6137144666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Nassoh Hafez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hafez (CPSO#: 86961 )
Business Address: 602 - 2 Gurdwara Road
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2
(613) 714-9855
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED NASSOH HAFEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED NASSOH HAFEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2007