THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:32:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2138

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sull (CPSO#: 86986 )
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2138

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sull (CPSO#: 86986 )
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS JAY SULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS JAY SULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007