THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:20:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 3108
Fax: (705) 876-5008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Moshkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Moshkin (CPSO#: 86990 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Moshkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 3108
Fax: (705) 876-5008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Moshkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Moshkin (CPSO#: 86990 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Moshkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA MIKHAILOVNA MOSHKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSHKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA MIKHAILOVNA MOSHKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSHKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007