THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:13:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054503200
Fax: 7055758890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record may contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 27 Jul 2018

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record may contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 ext. 221
Date Received: 22 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kucher (CPSO#: 87015 )
Business Address: 25 Woodhurst Drive
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 5Z5
Business Address: 955 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
7054503200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054503200
Fax: 7055758890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record may contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 27 Jul 2018

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record may contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 ext. 221
Date Received: 22 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kucher (CPSO#: 87015 )
Business Address: 25 Woodhurst Drive
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 5Z5
Business Address: 955 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
7054503200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON MATTHEW KUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON MATTHEW KUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007