THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 414 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-2662
Extension: 2
Fax: (416) 439-2552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Tabari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabari (CPSO#: 87032 )
Business Address: 414-3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 439-2662 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 414 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-2662
Extension: 2
Fax: (416) 439-2552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Tabari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabari (CPSO#: 87032 )
Business Address: 414-3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 439-2662 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007