THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: West China Medical University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 609-0000
Fax: (416) 609-0001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Real Estate Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Real Estate
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chongen Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Liu (CPSO#: 87033 )
Business Address: Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
(416) 609-0000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: West China Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 609-0000
Fax: (416) 609-0001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Real Estate Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Real Estate
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chongen Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Liu (CPSO#: 87033 )
Business Address: Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
(416) 609-0000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHONGEN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHONGEN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: West China Medical University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007