THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:10:09 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9050
Fax: 519-804-9046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Lubitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lubitz (CPSO#: 87038 )
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Medical Day Unit
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
(519) 783-0024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9050
Fax: 519-804-9046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Lubitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lubitz (CPSO#: 87038 )
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Medical Day Unit
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
(519) 783-0024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA JEAN LUBITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA JEAN LUBITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007