THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:36:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: Tipu, Raluca (Used Until: 09 Dec 2010)
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Milner Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raluca Kukreja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kukreja (CPSO#: 87041 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 1105 Kingston Road
200A Building E
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(416) 284-4744
Business Address: 410 - 325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5N1
(416) 284-4744

General Information

Former Name: Tipu, Raluca (Used Until: 09 Dec 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Milner Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raluca Kukreja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kukreja (CPSO#: 87041 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 1105 Kingston Road
200A Building E
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(416) 284-4744
Business Address: 410 - 325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5N1
(416) 284-4744

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALUCA KUKREJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKREJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALUCA KUKREJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKREJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007