THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Milanthi Hapuarachchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hapuarachchi (CPSO#: 87048 )
Business Address: Suite 1
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
(905) 875-9999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Milanthi Hapuarachchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hapuarachchi (CPSO#: 87048 )
Business Address: Suite 1
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
(905) 875-9999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILANTHI HAPUARACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAPUARACHCHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILANTHI HAPUARACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAPUARACHCHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007