THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052721104
Fax: 9052721105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Ki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ki (CPSO#: 87066 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Kidney Care Clinic
Suite 121 and 125
75 Watline Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3N6
(905) 813-4240
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Suite 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-1104

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052721104
Fax: 9052721105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Ki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ki (CPSO#: 87066 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Kidney Care Clinic
Suite 121 and 125
75 Watline Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3N6
(905) 813-4240
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Suite 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-1104

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT KI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT KI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007