THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:31:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76342
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samiee Zafarghandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samiee Zafarghandy (CPSO#: 87078 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76342

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76342
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samiee Zafarghandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samiee Zafarghandy (CPSO#: 87078 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76342

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIRA SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIRA SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007