THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 02:44:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Rd Suite 201
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Fax: (807) 623-5155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Exley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Exley (CPSO#: 87119 )
Business Address: Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 626-1223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Rd Suite 201
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Fax: (807) 623-5155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Exley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Exley (CPSO#: 87119 )
Business Address: Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 626-1223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM DOUGLAS EXLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EXLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM DOUGLAS EXLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EXLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007