THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN, ITALIAN, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8633 Weston Rd
Unit 6C
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-264-9859
Fax: 905-264-9311

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilda Hobdari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hobdari (CPSO#: 87139 )
Business Address: 8633 Weston Rd
Unit 6C
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
905-264-9859
Business Address: Suite 300
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
(904) 264-9311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN, ITALIAN, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8633 Weston Rd
Unit 6C
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-264-9859
Fax: 905-264-9311

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilda Hobdari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hobdari (CPSO#: 87139 )
Business Address: 8633 Weston Rd
Unit 6C
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
905-264-9859
Business Address: Suite 300
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
(904) 264-9311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILDA HOBDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBDARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILDA HOBDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBDARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007