THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:04:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room S1.184
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Salehi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salehi (CPSO#: 87180 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 7734
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Avenue East
Room S1.184
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room S1.184
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Salehi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salehi (CPSO#: 87180 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 7734
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Avenue East
Room S1.184
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEILA SALEHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEILA SALEHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007