THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:55:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Main Street
Lucan Medical Centre
Lucan ON N0M 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-227-1163
Fax: 519-227-1558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milagro Viguera Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Viguera Salazar (CPSO#: 87270 )
Business Address: Lucan Medical Centre
280 Main Street
Box 520
Lucan Ontario N0M 2J0
(519) 227-4015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Main Street
Lucan Medical Centre
Lucan ON N0M 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-227-1163
Fax: 519-227-1558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milagro Viguera Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Viguera Salazar (CPSO#: 87270 )
Business Address: Lucan Medical Centre
280 Main Street
Box 520
Lucan Ontario N0M 2J0
(519) 227-4015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAGRO CARIDAD VIGUERA SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGUERA SALAZAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAGRO CARIDAD VIGUERA SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGUERA SALAZAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2007