THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:26:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Of Ferrara, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-023
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York, ON M3M 0B2
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence Morriello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Morriello (CPSO#: 87275 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University Of Ferrara, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-023
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York, ON M3M 0B2
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence Morriello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Morriello (CPSO#: 87275 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLORENCE FILOMENA MORRIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIELLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLORENCE FILOMENA MORRIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIELLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Of Ferrara, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007