THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 08:18:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: 905 864 9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Patroi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patroi (CPSO#: 87293 )
Business Address: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
(905) 864-9898

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: 905 864 9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Patroi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patroi (CPSO#: 87293 )
Business Address: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
(905) 864-9898

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA PATROI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATROI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA PATROI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATROI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007