THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
77 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 275-4400
Fax: (905) 275-4403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaazou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zaazou (CPSO#: 87357 )
Business Address: Suite 308
77 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B7
(905) 275-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
77 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 275-4400
Fax: (905) 275-4403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaazou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zaazou (CPSO#: 87357 )
Business Address: Suite 308
77 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B7
(905) 275-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSTAFA ABDEL FATTAH TAHA ISMAIL ZAAZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAAZOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSTAFA ABDEL FATTAH TAHA ISMAIL ZAAZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAAZOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2007