THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-140 Oxford St E
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: 519-850-5099
Address: Tillsonburg District Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 688-1031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Butchey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butchey (CPSO#: 87374 )
Business Address: Oxford Street East
Old North Medical
Suite 200
London Ontario
519-850-3800
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611
Business Address: 1653 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6G 0V1
(519) 850-3800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-140 Oxford St E
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: 519-850-5099
Address: Tillsonburg District Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 688-1031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Butchey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butchey (CPSO#: 87374 )
Business Address: Oxford Street East
Old North Medical
Suite 200
London Ontario
519-850-3800
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611
Business Address: 1653 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6G 0V1
(519) 850-3800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT SATYAMURTI BUTCHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTCHEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT SATYAMURTI BUTCHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTCHEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2007