THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon St
Pembroke ENT clinic
139 Tower C
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 631 1414
Fax: 613 775 0676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Malaysia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N SANJEEVAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sanjeevan (CPSO#: 87451 )
Business Address: 201 Deacon St
139 tower C
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
613 631 1414

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon St
Pembroke ENT clinic
139 Tower C
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 631 1414
Fax: 613 775 0676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Malaysia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N SANJEEVAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sanjeevan (CPSO#: 87451 )
Business Address: 201 Deacon St
139 tower C
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
613 631 1414

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADARAJAH SANJEEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANJEEVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADARAJAH SANJEEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANJEEVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2007