THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:51:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Netaji Subhash Chandra Bose Med College, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)235-5232
Fax: (905)235-5231
Address: 76 GRENVILLE STREET
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 2690
Fax: (416) 603-2782
Address: #309, 1366 Yonge street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Phone: 416-963-5955
Fax: 416-963-5612

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.K. Siddha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddha (CPSO#: 87552 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor, New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 2690
Business Address: 1366 Yonge Street
Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Business Address: 679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Netaji Subhash Chandra Bose Med College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)235-5232
Fax: (905)235-5231
Address: 76 GRENVILLE STREET
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 2690
Fax: (416) 603-2782
Address: #309, 1366 Yonge street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Phone: 416-963-5955
Fax: 416-963-5612

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.K. Siddha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddha (CPSO#: 87552 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor, New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 2690
Business Address: 1366 Yonge Street
Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Business Address: 679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR SIDDHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR SIDDHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Netaji Subhash Chandra Bose Med College, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2007