THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 473-6654
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 406
140 Oxford St E
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 204-3959
Fax: (519) 438-2400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Soo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Soo (CPSO#: 87568 )
Business Address: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 473-6654

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 473-6654
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 406
140 Oxford St E
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 204-3959
Fax: (519) 438-2400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Soo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Soo (CPSO#: 87568 )
Business Address: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 473-6654

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA SOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA SOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2007