THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:46:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel-Dieu Grace Health Care
Geriatric Mental Health
1453 Prince Rd.
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-257-5105
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Owen (CPSO#: 87593 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Health Care
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5105

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel-Dieu Grace Health Care
Geriatric Mental Health
1453 Prince Rd.
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-257-5105
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Owen (CPSO#: 87593 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Health Care
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5105

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Jul 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 31 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

1. Dr. Richard John Owen may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Owen holds
an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Owen no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

1. Dr. Richard John Owen may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Owen holds
an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Owen no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2007