THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens University Kingston Gen Hosp
Department of Medicine Nephrology
Burr 3 038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 1234
Fax: (613) 548-2524

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Khaled Shamseddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shamseddin (CPSO#: 87605 )
Business Address: Queens University Kingston Gen Hosp
Department of Medicine Nephrology
Burr 3 038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 1234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens University Kingston Gen Hosp
Department of Medicine Nephrology
Burr 3 038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 1234
Fax: (613) 548-2524

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Khaled Shamseddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shamseddin (CPSO#: 87605 )
Business Address: Queens University Kingston Gen Hosp
Department of Medicine Nephrology
Burr 3 038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 1234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD KHALED SHAMSEDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSEDDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD KHALED SHAMSEDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSEDDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2007