THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: World On Yonge Medical Centre
Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyanzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kyanzadeh (CPSO#: 87656 )
Business Address: Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
(905) 597-5919

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: World On Yonge Medical Centre
Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyanzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kyanzadeh (CPSO#: 87656 )
Business Address: Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
(905) 597-5919

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAREIBORZ KYANZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYANZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAREIBORZ KYANZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYANZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2007