THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:49:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical Health Centre
101-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
Address: 181 Green Lane East
EAST GWILLIMBURY ONTARIO
Newmarket Ontario L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lulja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lulja (CPSO#: 87668 )
Business Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
(905) 853-0404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN
Medical School: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical Health Centre
101-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
Address: 181 Green Lane East
EAST GWILLIMBURY ONTARIO
Newmarket Ontario L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lulja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lulja (CPSO#: 87668 )
Business Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
(905) 853-0404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEVILA LULJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LULJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEVILA LULJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LULJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 May 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2007