THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 08:52:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Virginia, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 09 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Matisoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matisoff (CPSO#: 87686 )
Business Address: 65 Farmstead Road
Toronto Ontario M2L 2X2
2023607825

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Virginia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 09 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Matisoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matisoff (CPSO#: 87686 )
Business Address: 65 Farmstead Road
Toronto Ontario M2L 2X2
2023607825

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDREW JEFFREY MATISOFF may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDREW JEFFREY MATISOFF may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Virginia, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2007