THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Roseville Garden Dr.
Suite 301
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 915 0800
Fax: 519 915 8444
Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Bariatric Center
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: (519) 971-9566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neculau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Neculau (CPSO#: 87691 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace
Bariatric Clinic
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 971-9206
Business Address: Suite 301
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
(519) 915-0800
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Windsor ON N8W 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Roseville Garden Dr.
Suite 301
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 915 0800
Fax: 519 915 8444
Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Bariatric Center
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: (519) 971-9566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neculau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Neculau (CPSO#: 87691 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace
Bariatric Clinic
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 971-9206
Business Address: Suite 301
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
(519) 915-0800
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Windsor ON N8W 1L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADALINA NECULAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NECULAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADALINA NECULAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NECULAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2007