THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1K 5J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vakilha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakilha (CPSO#: 87730 )
Business Address: Suite C1D
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1K 5J2
(416) 266-5888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1K 5J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vakilha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakilha (CPSO#: 87730 )
Business Address: Suite C1D
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1K 5J2
(416) 266-5888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRDAD VAKILHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRDAD VAKILHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2007