THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Ph: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 650
Date Received: 30 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda M. Rempel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rempel (CPSO#: 87762 )
Business Address: 206 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 684-3111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Ph: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 650
Date Received: 30 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda M. Rempel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rempel (CPSO#: 87762 )
Business Address: 206 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 684-3111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA MARLENE REMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMPEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA MARLENE REMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMPEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2007