THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:32:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobourg Health Centre
9 Elgin St East Unit 6B
Cobourg Ontario K9A0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-1282
Fax: (905) 373-9335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirk Haunts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haunts (CPSO#: 87782 )
Business Address: Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
(905) 373-1282

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobourg Health Centre
9 Elgin St East Unit 6B
Cobourg Ontario K9A0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-1282
Fax: (905) 373-9335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirk Haunts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haunts (CPSO#: 87782 )
Business Address: Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
(905) 373-1282

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRK ALEXANDER HAUNTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAUNTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRK ALEXANDER HAUNTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAUNTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2007