THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:53:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universita di Milano, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Neonatology
Room 8259
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: (613) 737-8889
Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
401 Smyth Road
Division of Neonatology
Rm3421
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ferretti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ferretti (CPSO#: 87797 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Neonatology
Room 8259
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 78561
Business Address: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Universita di Milano, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Neonatology
Room 8259
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: (613) 737-8889
Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
401 Smyth Road
Division of Neonatology
Rm3421
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ferretti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ferretti (CPSO#: 87797 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Neonatology
Room 8259
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 78561
Business Address: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMANUELA FERRETTI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF NEONATAL-PERINATAL MEDICINE, DEPARTMENT OF PAEDIATRICS, UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. FERRETTI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. FERRETTI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMANUELA FERRETTI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF NEONATAL-PERINATAL MEDICINE, DEPARTMENT OF PAEDIATRICS, UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. FERRETTI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. FERRETTI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. FERRETTI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universita di Milano, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2007