THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:13:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue, Room D108
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 2895
Fax: (416) 480-4999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon D Rubenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rubenfeld (CPSO#: 87809 )
Business Address: 27 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4V 1E5
6472782828
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
6472782828

Corporation Name: Gordon D. Rubenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue, Room D108
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 2895
Fax: (416) 480-4999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon D Rubenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rubenfeld (CPSO#: 87809 )
Business Address: 27 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4V 1E5
6472782828
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
6472782828

Corporation Name: Gordon D. Rubenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON DAVID RUBENFELD may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, SUNNYBROOK HEALTH SCIENCES CENTRE in which Dr. RUBENFELD holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. RUBENFELD may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. RUBENFELD no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. RUBENFELD no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. RUBENFELD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON DAVID RUBENFELD may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, SUNNYBROOK HEALTH SCIENCES CENTRE in which Dr. RUBENFELD holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. RUBENFELD may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. RUBENFELD no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. RUBENFELD no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. RUBENFELD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2007