THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-141 King Rd
Richmond Hill ON L4E 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-313-8000
Fax: 905-313-8001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EVON KHALIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khalil (CPSO#: 87832 )
Business Address: 141 King Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3L7
4165226596

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-141 King Rd
Richmond Hill ON L4E 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-313-8000
Fax: 905-313-8001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EVON KHALIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khalil (CPSO#: 87832 )
Business Address: 141 King Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3L7
4165226596

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVON WANES HANNA KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVON WANES HANNA KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2007