THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 464 4400
Fax: 519 464 4400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may fax their request to the attention of Ms. Kirstin Kurian at Alpha IT: Fax 416 449 8543 or call 416 449 2100
Date Received: 15 Dec 2015

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Mohamed Ally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohamed Ally (CPSO#: 87849 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 464 4400
Fax: 519 464 4400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may fax their request to the attention of Ms. Kirstin Kurian at Alpha IT: Fax 416 449 8543 or call 416 449 2100
Date Received: 15 Dec 2015

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Mohamed Ally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohamed Ally (CPSO#: 87849 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMSHAAD BANU MOHAMED ALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED ALLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMSHAAD BANU MOHAMED ALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED ALLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2007