THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:17:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 653-3498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jill Hollowell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hollowell (CPSO#: 87872 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 653-3498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jill Hollowell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hollowell (CPSO#: 87872 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL SUZANNE HOLLOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL SUZANNE HOLLOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2007