THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-579-1212
Extension: 510
Fax: 289-731-2035
Address: 1006 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5P 2K8
Phone: 647-350-5500
Fax: 416-981-3322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Dukic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dukic (CPSO#: 87885 )
Business Address: 1006 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5P 2K8
647-350-5500
Business Address: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1212 Extn: 525
Business Address: 203 - 505 Eglinton Ave. W.
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B1
(647) 385-0550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-579-1212
Extension: 510
Fax: 289-731-2035
Address: 1006 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5P 2K8
Phone: 647-350-5500
Fax: 416-981-3322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Dukic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dukic (CPSO#: 87885 )
Business Address: 1006 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5P 2K8
647-350-5500
Business Address: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1212 Extn: 525
Business Address: 203 - 505 Eglinton Ave. W.
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B1
(647) 385-0550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA DUKIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA DUKIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007