THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:36:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 prom. Riverside drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82569
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Address: Cornwall Dialysis Clinic
691 Brookdale Ave
Cornwall Ontario K6J 5C6
Phone: 613-937-4555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. G. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clark (CPSO#: 87888 ) Dr. A. Baines (CPSO#: 96939 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital-Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Prom. Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 789-5555 Extn: 82569

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 prom. Riverside drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82569
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Address: Cornwall Dialysis Clinic
691 Brookdale Ave
Cornwall Ontario K6J 5C6
Phone: 613-937-4555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. G. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clark (CPSO#: 87888 ) Dr. A. Baines (CPSO#: 96939 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital-Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Prom. Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 789-5555 Extn: 82569

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2007