THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst St.
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2636
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Address: Women's College Hospital
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6407
Fax: (416) 323-6215
Address: 840 Coxwell Avenue
SETFHT
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Phone: 416-423-8800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400 The West Mall
Westburn Manor
Toronto Ontario M9C 5S1
Phone: 416-394-3600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3555 Danforth Avenue
Chester Village
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E3
Phone: (416) 466-2173
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Ott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ott (CPSO#: 87906 )
Business Address: Baycrest
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6E 2E1
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 2615
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6407

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst St.
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2636
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Address: Women's College Hospital
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6407
Fax: (416) 323-6215
Address: 840 Coxwell Avenue
SETFHT
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Phone: 416-423-8800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400 The West Mall
Westburn Manor
Toronto Ontario M9C 5S1
Phone: 416-394-3600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3555 Danforth Avenue
Chester Village
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E3
Phone: (416) 466-2173
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Ott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ott (CPSO#: 87906 )
Business Address: Baycrest
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6E 2E1
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 2615
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6407

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL LOUISE BAUNEMANN OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL LOUISE BAUNEMANN OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2007