THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:33:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4517
Fax: (705) 7431449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.C. Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hudson (CPSO#: 87911 )
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4517

Corporation Name: Neil C. Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4517
Fax: (705) 7431449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.C. Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hudson (CPSO#: 87911 )
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4517

Corporation Name: Neil C. Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL CRAIG HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL CRAIG HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2007