THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:05:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE 126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 18 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navpreet Sahsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sahsi (CPSO#: 87916 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE 126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE 126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 18 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navpreet Sahsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sahsi (CPSO#: 87916 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE 126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVPREET SINGH SAHSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVPREET SINGH SAHSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2007