THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:26:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zurich, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-468-2111
Fax: 905-468-4463
Address: 330 Main St E
Baywoods Place LTC Residence
Hamilton ON L8N 3T9
Phone: 905-523-7134
Fax: 905-570-0154

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records should be directed to:
Fruitland Crossing Medical Clinic
2 - 311 Fruitland Rd
Stoney Creek ON L8E 5M8

Tel: 289-656-1005`
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brunner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Brunner (CPSO#: 88028 )
Business Address: 120 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-Lake Ontario L0S 1J0
905-468-2111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Zurich, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-468-2111
Fax: 905-468-4463
Address: 330 Main St E
Baywoods Place LTC Residence
Hamilton ON L8N 3T9
Phone: 905-523-7134
Fax: 905-570-0154

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records should be directed to:
Fruitland Crossing Medical Clinic
2 - 311 Fruitland Rd
Stoney Creek ON L8E 5M8

Tel: 289-656-1005`
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brunner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Brunner (CPSO#: 88028 )
Business Address: 120 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-Lake Ontario L0S 1J0
905-468-2111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINHARD BRUNNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINHARD BRUNNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zurich, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2008