THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:41:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bharathiar University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
16600 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-8700
Fax: (905) 235-8701
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Srikanth Ramakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramakrishnan (CPSO#: 88033 )
Business Address: Suite 209
16600 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1Z9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Bharathiar University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
16600 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-8700
Fax: (905) 235-8701
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Srikanth Ramakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramakrishnan (CPSO#: 88033 )
Business Address: Suite 209
16600 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1Z9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SRIKANTH RAMAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SRIKANTH RAMAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bharathiar University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2008