THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 776 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Z 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-354-2000
Fax: 416-354-2434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Mar 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren J Sukerman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sukerman (CPSO#: 88072 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 776 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Z 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-354-2000
Fax: 416-354-2434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Mar 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren J Sukerman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sukerman (CPSO#: 88072 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARREN JAY SUKERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARREN JAY SUKERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2008