THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:22:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Minya, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical clinic
Unit 09
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-6733
Fax: (905) 235-8933
Address: CityMed Medical Centre
110 Brickyard Way
unit 6
Brampton Ontario L6V 4N1
Phone: (905) 457-1666
Fax: (905) 457-4666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanaa Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wassef (CPSO#: 88080 )
Business Address: Medical Clinic
Unit 09
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
(905) 235-6733
Business Address: 6 - 110 Brickyard Way
Brampton Ontario L6V 4N1
(905) 457-1666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Minya, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical clinic
Unit 09
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-6733
Fax: (905) 235-8933
Address: CityMed Medical Centre
110 Brickyard Way
unit 6
Brampton Ontario L6V 4N1
Phone: (905) 457-1666
Fax: (905) 457-4666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanaa Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wassef (CPSO#: 88080 )
Business Address: Medical Clinic
Unit 09
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
(905) 235-6733
Business Address: 6 - 110 Brickyard Way
Brampton Ontario L6V 4N1
(905) 457-1666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANAA SHOUKRI NASSIF WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANAA SHOUKRI NASSIF WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Minya, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2008