THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-221 Brant Ave
Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Feb 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Damboragama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Damboragama (CPSO#: 88101 )
Business Address: 64 Oriole Pky
Brantford ON N3R 6V9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-221 Brant Ave
Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Feb 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Damboragama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Damboragama (CPSO#: 88101 )
Business Address: 64 Oriole Pky
Brantford ON N3R 6V9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHYAMALI NIRANJALA DAMBORAGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMBORAGAMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHYAMALI NIRANJALA DAMBORAGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMBORAGAMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2008