THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-2870
Fax: (905) 595-2869
Address: Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 456-3699
Fax: (905) 456-8768
Address: Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan Ontario L4L9K8
Phone: 9058560900
Fax: 9058561300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram R. Comondore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Comondore (CPSO#: 88184 )
Business Address: Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 595-2870
Business Address: 106-3865 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L4H 4P4
(289) 217-6211
Business Address: Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843
Business Address: 216-40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H1
(905) 456-3699
Business Address: AA5-200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan Ontario L4L 9K8
(905) 856-1300
Business Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
9058561300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-2870
Fax: (905) 595-2869
Address: Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 456-3699
Fax: (905) 456-8768
Address: Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan Ontario L4L9K8
Phone: 9058560900
Fax: 9058561300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram R. Comondore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Comondore (CPSO#: 88184 )
Business Address: Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 595-2870
Business Address: 106-3865 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L4H 4P4
(289) 217-6211
Business Address: Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843
Business Address: 216-40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H1
(905) 456-3699
Business Address: AA5-200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan Ontario L4L 9K8
(905) 856-1300
Business Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
9058561300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKRAM RAVINDRAN COMONDORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMONDORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKRAM RAVINDRAN COMONDORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMONDORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2008