THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:42:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Extension: 5108
Fax: 416 323 6176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Jan 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eder (CPSO#: 88185 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(614) 323-6400 Extn: 5108

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Extension: 5108
Fax: 416 323 6176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Jan 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eder (CPSO#: 88185 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(614) 323-6400 Extn: 5108

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LIHI EDER may practise medicine independently in rheumatology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LIHI EDER may practise medicine independently in rheumatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2008