THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:54:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-8086
Fax: (613) 761-1944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.S. GREWAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grewal (CPSO#: 88228 )
Business Address: 201-1370 Clyde Ave
Nepean ON K2G 3H8
613-722-8086
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-4842
Business Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
613-938-4240, Ext 3524
Business Address: 2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
613-258-6133, Ext 153

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-8086
Fax: (613) 761-1944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.S. GREWAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grewal (CPSO#: 88228 )
Business Address: 201-1370 Clyde Ave
Nepean ON K2G 3H8
613-722-8086
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-4842
Business Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
613-938-4240, Ext 3524
Business Address: 2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
613-258-6133, Ext 153

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASVEG SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASVEG SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2008